This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 23:20:46 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF BETTY JANE GERULSKI

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF BETTY JANE GERULSKI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DUNHAM, JOANNE

Linden, MI 48451

GERULSKI, BEVERLY J.

Linden, MI 48451

Decedents

GERULSKI, BETTY

Gulfport, FL 33707

GERULSKI, BETTY JANE ALSO KNOWN AS GERULSKI BARKEY, BETTY JANE

Gulfport, FL 33707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PEGGY CLARIE SENENTZ

1101 Pasadena Ave S #3

South Pasadena, FL 33707

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 22; APPOINTING COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 21; APPOINTING COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 17; BETTY JANE GERULSKI BARKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DUNHAM, JOANNE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-01744; DUNHAM, JOANNE; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DUNHAM, JOANNE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 8; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 9; ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 11; BETTY JANE GERULSKI BARKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT, CONSENT & WAIVER; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT, CONSENT & WAIVER; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketWILL; Doc # 15; 04/20/2018 4 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEGGY CLARIE SENENTZ