This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 18:00:17 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF ANASTASIA M KAVOUKLIS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 IN RE THE ESTATE OF ANASTASIA M KAVOUKLIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-ES

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner

KAVOUKLIS, NIKITA

Decedent

KAVOUKLIS, ANASTASIA M ALSO KNOWN AS KAVOULKIS, ANASTASIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

N MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS, ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE Doc # 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketBOND $ Doc # 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS Doc # 16; 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION Doc # 12; Vol./Book 22301, Page 1971, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketESTATE BOND APPROVED $ Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketBOND $ Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketREMINDER: ELECTRONICALLY FILE BOND Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE Doc # 9; ANASTASIA M KAVOUKLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; KAVOUKLIS, NIKITA; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2022-43540; KAVOUKLIS, NIKITA; (400.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; KAVOUKLIS, NIKITA; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE Doc # 1; ANASTASIA M KAVOUKLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R) Doc # 2; Vol./Book 22282, Page 1521, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER Doc # 5; APPOINTING PR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS Doc # 6; OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less