Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/13/2021 at 16:50:21 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA Vs. EDWARD H PARMENTER, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HSBC BANK USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EDWARD H PARMENTER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA

500 South Australian Avenue Suite 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendants

PARMENTER, KARINA

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TINA MARIE PARMENTER

Crestview, FL 32536

PARMENTER, EDWARD H

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

PARMENTER, EDWARD H ALSO KNOWN AS PARMENTER, EDWARD ALSO KNOWN AS PARMENTER, EDWARD HALLIDAY

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TINA MARIE PARMENTER ALSO KNOWN AS PARMENTER, TINA M

Crestview, FL 32536

WARD, DAVID FORMERLY KNOWN AS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TINA MARIE PARMENTER AKA TINA M PARMENTER

Crestview, FL 32536

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACY ROBINS

Attorney at McCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY

500 South Australian Ave Suite 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/06/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/30/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/30/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/30/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/06/2019: VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (R)

12/06/2019: LIS PENDENS (R)

FORM B - NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

12/06/2019: FORM B - NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER

PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

12/06/2019: PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

12/06/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HSBC BANK USA; Total Financial Assessment; 457.50; Total Payments and Credits; 457.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-10516; HSBC BANK USA; (18.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HSBC BANK USA; Total Financial Assessment; 457.50; Total Payments and Credits; 457.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HSBC BANK USA; Total Financial Assessment; 457.50; Total Payments and Credits; 457.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (R); Doc # 17; WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 20995, Page 1479, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 12; 121219; Party: PARMENTER, EDWARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 13; 121219; Party: PARMENTER, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 14; 122719 FKA UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TINA MARIE PARMENTER; Party: WARD, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HSBC BANK USA; Total Financial Assessment; 457.50; Total Payments and Credits; 457.50; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46065; HSBC BANK USA; (439.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 4; CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET; Doc # 5; FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFORM B - NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (R); Doc # 7; Vol./Book 20805, Page 661, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 8; ISSUED; Party: PARMENTER, EDWARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ISSUED; Party: PARMENTER, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 10; ISSUED; Party: WARD, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robins, Stacy Dale