This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:04:24 (UTC).

HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC Vs. MICHAEL HERSH

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL HERSH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC

3902 N. Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC DOING BUSINESS AS HILLSIDE MOBILE HOME PARK

3902 N. Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendants

HERSH, MICHAEL

Clearwater, FL 33759

HERSH, MICHAEL ALSO KNOWN AS HERCH, MICHAEL R

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN J VATALARO

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

3902 North Marguerite St

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/19/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/06/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/27/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

12/26/2019: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/20/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/26/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/20/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 15; W/O PREJUDICE BY; Party: HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 12; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20832, Page 2449, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 8; Party: HERSH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 7; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; Party: HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 6; 121119; Party: HERSH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 5; Party: HERSH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46017; HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; HILLSIDE CW MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A 5 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: HERSH, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less