This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 06:32:16 (UTC).

HILDA LOAIZA Vs. FRANCIS JOSEPH AMBROSIO, JR

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 HILDA LOAIZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANCIS JOSEPH AMBROSIO, JR. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOAIZA, HILDA

Seminole, FL 33776

Respondent

AMBROSIO, FRANCIS JOSEPH, JR

Seminole, FL 33776

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Doc # 13; Vol./Book 22292, Page 1417, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFAMILY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 10; NEED TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 11; (ZOOM) 121422 @ 9:00 AM (MAILED & EMAILED TO PARTIES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LOAIZA, HILDA; Total Financial Assessment; 414.00; Total Payments and Credits; 414.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2022-11617; LOAIZA, HILDA; (414.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; LOAIZA, HILDA; Total Financial Assessment; 414.00; Total Payments and Credits; 414.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Doc # 2; Party:; AMBROSIO, FRANCIS JOSEPH, JR; Party:; LOAIZA, HILDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 8; Party:; AMBROSIO, FRANCIS JOSEPH, JR; Party:; LOAIZA, HILDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less