Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/15/2021 at 07:08:37 (UTC).

HERMINIO JOSUE PENA OTERO Vs. ERIKA PENA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 HERMINIO JOSUE PENA OTERO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ERIKA PENA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-FD

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE

Holiday, FL 34691

Respondent

PENA, ERIKA

Clearwater, FL 33759

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 9; (TELEPHONIC 03/17/21 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE; Total Financial Assessment; 415.35; Total Payments and Credits; 415.35; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04378; PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE; (415.35)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE; Total Financial Assessment; 415.35; Total Payments and Credits; 415.35; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE; Total Financial Assessment; 415.35; Total Payments and Credits; 415.35; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 7; Party: PENA OTERO, HERMINIO JOSUE; Party: PENA, ERIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY; Doc # 8; BOTH PARTIES SOCIAL SECURITY CARDS

    Read MoreRead Less