Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:05:49 (UTC).

GWEN E MARTONE MAZZA Vs. JAMES MICHAEL MAZZA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 GWEN E MARTONE MAZZA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JAMES MICHAEL MAZZA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SERCUS, JULIE L. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-FD

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SERCUS, JULIE L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTONE MAZZA, GWEN E

Clearwater, FL 33756

Respondent

MAZZA, JAMES MICHAEL

Clearwater, FL 33756

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADAM R SACKRIN

Attorney at WEST FAMILY LAW GROUP

7009 Dr Phillips Blvd Suite 130

Orlando, FL 32819

Respondent Attorneys

MARC N PELLETIER, ESQ

Attorney at RUSSO PELLETIER & SULLIVAN P A

9721 Executive Ctr Dr N Ste 120

St Petersburg, FL 33702

MICHAEL P LOBERG, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL LOBERG P A

200 - 9Th Ave N Ste 150

Safety Harbor, FL 34695-3559

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY; PELLETIER, MARC N, ESQ; Total Financial Assessment; 5.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5.00; Balance Due 0.00; Draw Down Account; Receipt # CV-2021-09701; RUSSO, PELLETIER & SULLIVAN, P.A. (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY; PELLETIER, MARC N, ESQ; Total Financial Assessment; 5.00; Total Payments and Credits; 5.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 19; MODIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 18; FROM PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 16; LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 17; Party: MARTONE MAZZA, GWEN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer LOAR, DONEENE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE; Doc # 13; 09042021; Vol./Book 21423, Page 2628, 7 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE; Doc # 15; /NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 03102021 8:30

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION (SRS); Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEMAIL AUTHORIZED ON INJUNCTION FOR VIOLENCE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASES JUDICIALLY NOTICED; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARC N PELLETIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL P LOBERG