This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:08:07 (UTC).

GUSTAVO TORRES Vs. SCARLETH DE LA MOTA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GUSTAVO TORRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCARLETH DE LA MOTA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES, GUSTAVO

Tampa, FL 33615

Defendant

DE LA MOTA, SCARLETH

Tampa, FL 33615

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

12/06/2019: APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS DEFT PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

12/09/2019: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

01/09/2020: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

12/17/2019: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

01/09/2020: STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Doc # 6; NOT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 3; Party: DE LA MOTA, SCARLETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TORRES, GUSTAVO; Total Financial Assessment; 6.85; Total Payments and Credits; 6.85; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-31172; TORRES, GUSTAVO; (6.85)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TORRES, GUSTAVO; Total Financial Assessment; 6.85; Total Payments and Credits; 6.85; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 6.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TORRES, GUSTAVO; Total Financial Assessment; 6.85; Total Payments and Credits; 6.85; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TORRES, GUSTAVO; Total Financial Assessment; 6.85; Total Payments and Credits; 6.85; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1; W/ EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED; Doc # 2; Party: TORRES, GUSTAVO

    Read MoreRead Less