This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/21/2021 at 08:10:45 (UTC).

GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC Vs. MAD ROOFING INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAD ROOFING INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC DOING BUSINESS AS GULFEAGLE SUPPLY

1701 Dr. Mlk Street North

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendants

DELABRUERE, MARCEL

Melbourne, FL 32934

MAD ROOFING INC

369 Gates Street Sw

Palm Bay, FL 32908

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E BURGUIERES, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E BURGUIERES PA

1701 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

07/19/2021: SUMMONS - NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

07/15/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/04/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

06/22/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

COMPLAINT

06/22/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 8; WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: DELABRUERE, MARCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 07012021; Party: MAD ROOFING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-24666; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; (320.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 320.00; Total Payments and Credits; 320.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: MAD ROOFING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party: DELABRUERE, MARCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC DOING BUSINESS AS GULFEAGLE SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E BURGUIERES