This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/21/2021 at 08:27:38 (UTC).

GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC, DOING BUSINESS AS KIMAL LUMBER Vs. WILLIAM R FLYNN CONTRACTOR INC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC, DOING BUSINESS AS KIMAL LUMBER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM R FLYNN CONTRACTOR INC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC DOING BUSINESS AS LUMBER, KIMAL

1701 Dr. Mlk Street North

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

WILLIAM R FLYNN CONTRACTOR INC

4817 Ashton Road

Sarasota, FL 34233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E BURGUIERES, ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E BURGUIERES PA

1701 Dr Mlk Jr St North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

07/19/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom328723509

06/25/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/22/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 4; Party: WILLIAM R FLYNN CONTRACTOR INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-24673; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSIDE SUPPLY INC DOING BUSINESS AS GULFEAGLE SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E BURGUIERES