This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 19:17:15 (UTC).

GREAT SOUTHERN BANK Vs. ARLEY ADCOCK

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 GREAT SOUTHERN BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ARLEY ADCOCK. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT SOUTHERN BANK

Defendant

ADCOCK, ARLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL A HUMBERT, ESQ

 

Court Documents

F-J-Filing Notice-Out of State

09/15/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR

09/13/2021: RECORDED CC JUDGMENT

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

09/15/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/03/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

10/29/2021: RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE

ORDER

02/09/2022: ORDER

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

01/07/2022: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE

01/07/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 9; ON JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S NON EVIDENTIARY MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 8; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6; IN AID OF EXECUTION TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketRETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; Doc # 5; NOTICE OF FILING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 3; FOREIGN JUDGMENT W/ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GREAT SOUTHERN BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 488.88; Total Payments and Credits; 488.88; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GREAT SOUTHERN BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 488.88; Total Payments and Credits; 488.88; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-35463; GREAT SOUTHERN BANK; (488.88)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GREAT SOUTHERN BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 488.88; Total Payments and Credits; 488.88; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 488.88

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRECORDED CC JUDGMENT; Doc # 2; W ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT FROM GREEN COUNTY MISSOURI FORWARDED TO RECORDING 09/15/2021; Vol./Book 21716, Page 248, 4 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less