This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:09:14 (UTC).

GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC Vs. TAQUISA TOLBERT

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAQUISA TOLBERT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC

Po Box 62884

Ft Myers, FL 33906

Defendant

TOLBERT, TAQUISA

St Petersburg, FL 33710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN P WOLK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HEIST WEISSE & WOLK PA

Post Office Box 62884

Fort Myers, FL 33906

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/06/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/02/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/06/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/17/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/17/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/17/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/17/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20835, Page 94, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; Party: TOLBERT, TAQUISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 120919; Party: TOLBERT, TAQUISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; Party: GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: TOLBERT, TAQUISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46071; GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GOLDELM AT NAUTICA LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: TOLBERT, TAQUISA

    Read MoreRead Less