This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/18/2023 at 13:33:51 (UTC).

GIRARD LAWS Vs. ASHLEY NICOLE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 GIRARD LAWS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY NICOLE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWS, GIRARD

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ASHLEY NICOLE

St Petersburg, FL 33712

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/07/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE

10/24/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

10/14/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/07/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/04/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 20; OF CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 17; DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 18; OF DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; Doc # 15; Party:; HARPER, SHAQUANA C, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 14; Party:; WILLIAMS, ASHLEY NICOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 12; Party:; WILLIAMS, ASHLEY NICOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LAWS, GIRARD; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-28973; LAWS, GIRARD; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LAWS, GIRARD; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2; FOR MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; WILLIAMS, ASHLEY NICOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less