This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 03/12/2022 at 08:18:56 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC Vs. MARCEL JADRNICEK

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCEL JADRNICEK. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

JADRNICEK, MARCEL

Clearwater, FL 33767-1011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JESSICA J FAGEN

100 Second Ave S Ste 306-S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

CAROLINA A CORONA-JAMIEL, ESQ

Attorney at RAUSCH STRUM LLP

100 Second Avenue S Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

01/11/2022: COMPLAINT E-FILED

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/11/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

EXHIBIT

01/11/2022: EXHIBIT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331871630

01/13/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

02/02/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 5; Party: JADRNICEK, MARCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01127; GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORONA-JAMIEL CAROLINA A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J