This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/08/2018 at 21:18:20 (UTC).

FV REO I LLC Vs. JAMES P FARNHAM, SR, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2012 FV REO I LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES P FARNHAM, SR. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FV REO I LLC

Defendants

AYLESFORD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC C/O JOSEPH CIANFRONE PA RA

1964 Bayshore Blvd

Dunedin, FL 34698

FARNHAM, JAMES P, SR

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

FARNHAM, KAREN A

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA AS NOMINEE FOR HOME LOA

1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA AS NOMINEE FOR HOME LOAN CENTER INC DOING BUSINESS AS LENDING TREE LOANS

1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ERIC M KNOPP

Attorney at KAHANE AND ASSOCIATES P A

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324

CLIVE M RYAN

Attorney at KAHANE AND ASSOCIATES PA

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH R CIANFRONE

Attorney at CIANFRONE NIKOLOFF GRANT

1964 Bayshore Blvd Ste A

Dunedin, FL 34698

PATRICK J HALPIN

695 Central Ave Suite 273

St Petersburg, FL 33701

PATRICK J HALPIN, ESQ

Attorney at PATRICK J HALPIN P A

695 Central Ave Ste 273

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

07/16/2014: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/07/2014: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/06/2013: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE BORROWER NONPART FORECLOSURE MEDIATION

04/01/2013: NOTICE BORROWER NONPART FORECLOSURE MEDIATION

DEF RESP'S MOTION

03/25/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

DEF RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/04/2013: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

VALUE OF REAL PROP MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/19/2012: VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2012: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/19/2012: COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL NOTICE

06/20/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

06/20/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS

07/07/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

03/08/2013: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

03/08/2013: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

01/16/2013: SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/16/2013: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/16/2013: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2014
  • CANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; W/O PREJ/DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - RETD 11/26/14; Vol./Book 18472, Page 1709, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS; PURSUANT TO LOSS MITIGATION/DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/ RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF HEARING 081613 9:15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2012
  • CASE FILED; Party: AYLESFORD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Party: FARNHAM, JAMES P, SR; Party: FARNHAM, KAREN A; Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; Party: UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 17834, Page 542, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER - PICK UP; PROVEST; Party: AYLESFORD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Party: FARNHAM, JAMES P, SR; Party: FARNHAM, KAREN A; Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; Party: UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; FV REO I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 1,964.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,964.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SPB-2012-06530; KAHANE AND ASSOCIATES; (1,964.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; FV REO I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 1,964.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,964.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; FV REO I LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 1,964.00; Total Payments and Credits; 1,964.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,963.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FV REO I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AYLESFORD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK J HALPIN