This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 20:26:15 (UTC).

FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC Vs. JUSTIN DANH.et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUSTIN DANH. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC

9505 49Th Street N

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Defendants

CHHUE, MELINDA

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

DANH, JUSTIN

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

SINGSAY, PHAY

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW E SIEGEL

2753 State Road 580 Suite 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

CERT OF MAILING - CO

01/14/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERT OF MAILING - CO

01/14/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS-ISSUED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS-ISSUED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

THREE DAY NOTICE

01/12/2022: THREE DAY NOTICE

LEASE

01/12/2022: LEASE

COMPLAINT

01/12/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

WRIT - SERVED

03/14/2022: WRIT - SERVED

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/31/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

CLERK DEFAULT ENTERED

01/27/2022: CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/27/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

01/27/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

01/27/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

01/27/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/27/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketWRIT - SERVED; Doc # 20; - WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED; Doc # 19; Party: CHHUE, MELINDA; Party: DANH, JUSTIN; Party: SINGSAY, PHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 18; Vol./Book 21914, Page 20, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY - CASE DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 13; 01/18/2022; Party: DANH, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 14; 01/14/22; Party: CHHUE, MELINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - POSTED; Doc # 15; 01/14/22; Party: SINGSAY, PHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 16; Party: CHHUE, MELINDA; Party: DANH, JUSTIN; Party: SINGSAY, PHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 10; Party: DANH, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01314; FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC; (215.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 215.00; Total Payments and Credits; 215.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: SINGSAY, PHAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; Party: CHHUE, MELINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party: DANH, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORTY NINTH FL PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD