This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/20/2023 at 07:17:56 (UTC).

FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC Vs. TIM GORSLINE

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TIM GORSLINE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC

1980 Michigan Ave.

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

GORSLINE, TIM

Largo, FL 33771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY R LOTANE, ESQ

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES PA

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant Attorney

DAVID C HICKS, ESQ

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP PA

1401 Manatee Avenue West Suite 1010

Bradenton, FL 34205

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/30/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

EXHIBIT

12/30/2022: EXHIBIT

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337729247

01/04/2023: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/09/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

01/19/2023: NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); NON-SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 6; 01192023; Party:; GORSLINE, TIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party:; GORSLINE, TIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-46535; FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 3; BY DC NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; A FEDERAL TRUTH-IN-LENDING DISCLOSURES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less