This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/01/2023 at 07:05:21 (UTC).

FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP Vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP DOING BUSINESS AS SPINE CORRECTIONS AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR WRIGHT, WESLEY

3900 Military Trail, Suite 600

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER W KELLAM

Attorney at KELLER MELCHIORRE & WALSH

3900 Military Trail Ste 600

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant Attorney

JOHN P KOPLITZ, ESQ

Attorney at OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/11/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

01/11/2023: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

01/17/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION

01/29/2023: MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/29/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/31/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 7; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Party:; FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 5; TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Filed by:; OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party:; OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 4; WITH ATTACHED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2023-01114; FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP; (185.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA SPINE AND WELLNESS CENTER CORP; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less