This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 20:14:39 (UTC).

FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR EDNA RIST Vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR EDNA RIST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR RIST, EDNA

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorneys

NIGEL NORTHE, ESQ

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

BRANDI R LONDRICO

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

DREW KRIEGER, ESQ

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

KRISTEN L WENGER

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3629

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/14/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

01/14/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331940096

01/19/2022: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/08/2022: JOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

AGREED ORDER

02/08/2022: AGREED ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION

02/08/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

02/09/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

02/19/2022: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

02/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 15; W/ ATTD EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; Doc # 16; (AMENDED); Party: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIP TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Doc # 8; AND FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 9; TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; /DISCLOSURE/DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Party: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 7; PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01714; FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA MUSCULOSKELETAL SURGICAL GROUP LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR LOVE, YOLANDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ