This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 08:08:39 (UTC).

FLORIDA CREDIT UNION Vs. JAHMIL RASHUN JACKSON

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 FLORIDA CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against JAHMIL RASHUN JACKSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY, LORRAINE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CO

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA CREDIT UNION

C/O P. Koren Hardy Post Office Box 3637

Tallahassee, FL 32315-3637

Defendant

JACKSON, JAHMIL RASHUN

Largo, FL 33771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

P KOREN HARDY

3637

Tallahassee, FL 32315

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

08/03/2022: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

07/29/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - ISSUED

07/29/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 6; OF HEARING 09202022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Doc # 5; 2 cc ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE MAILED TO PLTF ATTNY; Party: HARDY, P KOREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA CREDIT UNION; Total Financial Assessment; 495.00; Total Payments and Credits; 495.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2022-18254; FLORIDA CREDIT UNION; (495.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; FLORIDA CREDIT UNION; Total Financial Assessment; 495.00; Total Payments and Credits; 495.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: JACKSON, JAHMIL RASHUN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARDY ESQ, P KOREN