This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 09:02:08 (UTC).

FAY BURKE Vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 FAY BURKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURKE, FAY

Defendant

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC DOING BUSINESS AS PUBLIX STORE 1335

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGANNA FRANTZIS, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

LINDSAY T BRIGMAN, ESQ

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/14/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

11/18/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/18/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - ISSUED

11/18/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

12/09/2022: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/14/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

AGREED ORDER

12/29/2022: AGREED ORDER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/21/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION TO AMEND

12/28/2022: MOTION TO AMEND

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

12/28/2022: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Doc # 15; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND; Doc # 13; COMPLAINT; Party:; BURKE, FAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 14; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 8; COMPLAINT; WITH ATTACHMENTS; Party:; PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 6; Party:; PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BURKE, FAY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-42078; BURKE, FAY; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BURKE, FAY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 5; Party:; PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less