Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:05:52 (UTC).

EUGENIA GUNN DAVIS BORRUSCH Vs. MARY MARGUETTE BORRUSCH

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 EUGENIA GUNN DAVIS BORRUSCH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARY MARGUETTE BORRUSCH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HELINGER, JACK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-FD

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HELINGER, JACK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BORRUSCH, EUGENIA GUNN DAVIS

St Petersburg, FL 33709

Respondent

BORRUSCH, MARY MARGUETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer LOAR, DONEENE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION; Doc # 12; Vol./Book 21424, Page 86, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION - SERVED; Doc # 11; 02242021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION (SRS); Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEMAIL AUTHORIZED ON INJUNCTION FOR VIOLENCE; Doc # 6; SENT 02/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASES JUDICIALLY NOTICED; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF; Doc # 10; PINELLAS

    Read MoreRead Less