This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/12/2021 at 07:55:48 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JOSEPH J PILLUCERE SR Vs. BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 ESTATE OF JOSEPH J PILLUCERE SR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF JOSEPH J PILLUCERE SR BY AND THROUGH PILLUCERE CLARK, MICHELLE, PERSONAL REP

Defendants

KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS KANNON HEALTH MANAGEMTN LLC

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC ALSO KNOWN AS BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONNA K HANES, ESQ

Attorney at WILKES AND ASSOCIATES PA

One N Dale Mabry Hwy Tampa Commons Suite 800

Tampa, FL 33609

BLAIR N MENDES, ESQ

279

Palm Harbor, FL 34682

Defendant Attorney

KRISTEN OVER

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON ROSEN VINCI LLP

360 Central Ave #1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

03/17/2020: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

04/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

11/18/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/09/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/09/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

04/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 104; TO MEDICARE REOUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 105

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 106; ANSWERS TO MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 83; RESPONSES TO INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 84; RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 85; RESPONSES TO E-MAIL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 86; RESPONSES TO INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 87; RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 88; RESPONSES TO E-MAIL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 38; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 39; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 40; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 41; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 42; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 43; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 44; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 45; NOT ISSUED/WRONG CLERK NAME LISTED BY SIGNATURE LINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less