This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/23/2021 at 10:51:26 (UTC).

ESTATE OF FREDDIE LEE MELLS Vs. BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2018 ESTATE OF FREDDIE LEE MELLS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF FREDDIE LEE MELLS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE MELLS FERGUSON, THELMA L

Defendants

KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS KANNON HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

HAYDEN, ANDREA ROCHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONNA K HANES, ESQ

BLAIR N MENDES, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES D MORIARTY, ESQ

KRISTEN OVER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

03/28/2019: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/25/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322668919-715

06/05/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/24/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/01/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322668919-714

06/05/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322668919-716

06/05/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

06/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice322668919-24

07/03/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JIROTKA, GEORGE M); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 52; (SECOND) W/ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 51; SECOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; Doc # 50; Party: ESTATE OF FREDDIE LEE MELLS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 48; Party: AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC; Party: BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC; Party: HAYDEN, ANDREA ROCHELLE; Party: KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE; Doc # 47; AND E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 44; (MEDICARE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 45; RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 26; ISSUED; Party: BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 27; ISSUED; Party: KANNON HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 28; ISSUED; Party: AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 29; ISSUED; Party: HAYDEN, ANDREA ROCHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less