Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/13/2021 at 01:02:48 (UTC).

ELIZABETH WALKER Vs. RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 ELIZABETH WALKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ST. ARNOLD, JACK R and COVERT, THANE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ST. ARNOLD, JACK R

COVERT, THANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER, ELIZABETH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ESTATE OF COOLIE WALKER DECEASED

Defendants

RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY BROWN AND WILLIAMSON TOBACCO CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR TO BY MERGER

VECTOR GROUP LTD INC

LIGGETT GROUP LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS LIGGETT AND MYERS TOBACCO COMPANY FORMERLY KNOWN AS LIGGETT GROUP INC

LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY

PHILIP MORRIS USA INC

RJ REYNOLD TOBACCO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN S KALIL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN S KALIL P A

6817 Southpoint Pky Suite 1402

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHANIE E PARKER

Attorney at JONES DAY

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

ROBERT B PARRISH

Attorney at MOSELEY PRICHARD PARRISH KNIGHT AND JONES

501 W Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

KELLY ANNE LUTHER

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES

1441 Brickell Ave Ste 1420

Miami, FL 33131

TROY A FUHRMAN

Attorney at HILL WARD AND HENDERSON

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33601

DAVID M WOODS

Attorney at HUGHES HUBBARD & REED LLP

2345 Grand Blvd Ste 2000

Kansas City, MO 64108

TROY A FUHRMAN, ESQ

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

2231

Tampa, FL 33601-2231

TERRI L PARKER

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY AND BACON LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

KRISTOPHER J VERRA

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY BACON LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

DANA GIBSON BRADFORD, II

Attorney at SMITH GAMBRELL AND RUSSELL LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

CATHY A KAMM

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

BONNIE C DABOLL

Attorney at JOHNSON DABOLL ANDERSON

2011 Cleveland Street Suite F

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice311365932-978

08/10/2018: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice311365932-977

08/10/2018: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice311365932-88

08/10/2018: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice311365932-18

08/10/2018: DISMISSAL NOTICE

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/12/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/12/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/12/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/12/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

07/12/2017: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice319422943-773

11/01/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice319422943-608

11/01/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice319422943-607

11/01/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice319422943-606

11/01/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice319422943-551

11/01/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice318905971-447

10/04/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice318905971-445

10/04/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice318905971-444

10/04/2019: DISMISSAL NOTICE

MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

12/12/2019: MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer COVERT, THANE); CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Doc # 5; LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY / LIGGETT GROUP LLC / VECTOR GROUP LTD INC / RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; Vol./Book 20812, Page 2414, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ST. ARNOLD, JACK R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docket(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 2; W/O PREJUDICE AS TO R J REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY / PHILIP MORRIS USA INC BY; Party: WALKER, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketNOTICE; OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL / AMENDED EMAIL ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FOR DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AND DESIGNATION OF MAIL; Party: LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY; Party: RJ REYNOLD TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120512 PLTF REPLY TO DEF PHILIP MORRIS USA INC ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120512 PLTF REPLY TO DEF RJ REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120512 PLTF REPLY TO DEF LIGGETT GROUP LLC ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120512 PLTF REPLY TO DEF VECTOR GROUP LTDS ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 103015 DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DUPLICATIVE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120116 DEF PHILIP MORRIS USA INC NOTICE OF SERVING LIMITED FORUM NON CONVENIENS DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 120116 PROPOSED ORDER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED ACTIVATING CASES FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF DISCOVERY AND MOTION PRACTICE RE FORUM NON CONVENIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 013017 PLTF NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO DEF PHILIP MORRIS USA INC LIMTIED FORUM NON CONVENIENS DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 020317 MOTION OF PHILIP MORRIS USA INC TO TRANSFER CASES TO MORE CONVENIENT FORUMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; 062017 AGREED ORDER ON PHILIP MORRIS USA INC MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE'S GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VECTOR GROUP, LTD., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIGGETT GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where R J REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY is a litigant