This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/25/2023 at 20:07:55 (UTC).

ELIZABETH ROOK, et al Vs. CITY OF ST PETERSBURG, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 ELIZABETH ROOK, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF ST PETERSBURG,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCGILVREY, ERIN

Clearwater, FL 33764

ROOK, ELIZABETH

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendants

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

Tallahassee, FL 32399

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW S CARNEY, ESQ

Attorney at CAREY LEISURE & NEAL

622 Bypass Drive Suite 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH P PATNER

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY FOR THE CITY OF ST PETERSBUR

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

SHAQUANA C HARPER, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERICK D MARTIN BUILDING A SUITE

100 4030 Crescent Park Dr

Riverview, FL 33578

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/03/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/03/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/27/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/27/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

EXHIBIT

10/27/2022: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/13/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/13/2023: REQUEST FOR COPIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/06/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/06/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Doc # 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 46; (AND SECOND SET OF INSURANCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 41

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; 30 DAY SUMMONS; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party:; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 4; 30 DAY SUMMONS; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 6; A - DEMAND LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 7; AS TO CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8; AS TO CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9; AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 10; AS TO CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 11; AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less