This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/18/2019 at 08:04:29 (UTC).

EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC Vs. SEAN JACKSON

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEAN JACKSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC

C/O John E. Mcmillan, 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC DOING BUSINESS AS RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE APARTMENTS

C/O John E. Mcmillan, 5309 E. Busch Blvd.

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

Defendant

JACKSON, SEAN

St. Petersburg, FL 33712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E McMILLAN

Attorney at JOHN E McMILLAN PA

5309 East Busch Blvd

Temple Terrace, FL 33617

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/12/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

02/11/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

02/11/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/28/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/29/2019: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

01/29/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

01/29/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

ANSWER OF

01/24/2019: ANSWER OF

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

01/22/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

01/17/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 12; Vol./Book 20430, Page 929, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT; Doc # 13; AS TO COUNT I; Party: JACKSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 012119; Party: JACKSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • ANSWER OF; Doc # 7; Party: JACKSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: JACKSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 2; LEASE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 3; THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: JACKSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-02291; EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; EL-AD RESERVE AT LAKE POINTE LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less