This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 20:07:34 (UTC).

DORI NUSSBAUM Vs. CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 DORI NUSSBAUM filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF ST PETERSBURG. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUSSBAUM, DORI

Trinity, FL 34655

Defendants

CITY OF ST. PETERSBURG

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR, ESQ

Attorney at UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN P A

Patriot Bank Bldg 2Nd Flr 1815 Little Road

Trinity, FL 34655-5301

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH P PATNER

Attorney at EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT CITY ATTY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/10/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

EXHIBIT

01/10/2022: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/10/2022: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/04/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/28/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

03/04/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 9; (NO CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10; (NO CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 6; Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NUSSBAUM, DORI; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-01102; NUSSBAUM, DORI; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NUSSBAUM, DORI; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; A CERTIFIED LETTER REGARDING CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; B CORRESPONDENCE REGARDING CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH P PATNER