Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 06/25/2021 at 07:05:57 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK Vs. MELVIN RUCKER

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MELVIN RUCKER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

P.O. Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

Defendant

RUCKER, MELVIN

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ASHLEY L BROWN

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PLC

48979

Tampa, FL 33646

ASHLEY L BROWN, ESQ

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PLC

48979

Tampa, FL 33646

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

06/22/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom328385627

06/08/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

06/04/2021: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

EXHIBIT

06/04/2021: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

06/04/2021: EXHIBIT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/04/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH); NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: RUCKER, MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-22336; DISCOVER BANK; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY L BROWN