This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/01/2023 at 07:15:21 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK Vs. BARBARA PICCOLI

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARBARA PICCOLI. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

PICCOLI, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY L. BLANCO, ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/11/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT

01/11/2023: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/11/2023: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

01/11/2023: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom337943779

01/18/2023: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2023-01402; DISCOVER BANK; (310.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less