This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 14:50:44 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK Vs. IMELDA B LEON

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IMELDA B LEON. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

6413 Congress Avenue Suite 150

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

LEON, IMELDA B

Clearwater, FL 33763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER DUNN

Attorney at RAS LAVRAR LLC

1133 S University Dr 2Nd Fl

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT E-FILED

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE

NOTICE

11/22/2021: NOTICE

SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

11/22/2021: SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom331135113

11/24/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/02/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

01/20/2022: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; LEON, IMELDA B; Total Financial Assessment; 1.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1.20; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2022-01452; LEON, IMELDA B; (1.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; LEON, IMELDA B; Total Financial Assessment; 1.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 7; COUNT 1; Party: LEON, IMELDA B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; Party: LEON, IMELDA B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-45157; DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; (310.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment; 310.00; Total Payments and Credits; 310.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT E-FILED; Doc # 2; WITH ACCOUNT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 4; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - NOT ISSUED; Doc # 5; NOT USED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER DUNN