This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/03/2021 at 19:08:21 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES Vs. NATHAN E KARST

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against NATHAN E KARST. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RONDOLINO, ANTHONY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Justice Center - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RONDOLINO, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant

KARST, NATHAN E

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REBECCA PETTIT

Attorney at DEPT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY & MOTOR VEHICLES

11305 N Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

APRIL M. HAILE

Attorney at DEPT OF HWY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

133 S Semoran Blvd Ste A

Orlando, FL 32807

Defendant Attorney

MELINDA A MORRIS, ESQ

 

Court Documents

DEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

12/07/2020: DEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/07/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/02/2020: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/26/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/16/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/16/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FILING

07/16/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/15/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/18/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR

04/02/2019: REQUEST FOR

COMPLAINT

04/02/2019: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

04/02/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

03/04/2019: COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/04/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 20; DEFT MOTN WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION; Doc # 21; TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Doc # 18; AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S AMENDED MOTION; Doc # 19; TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Doc # 17; AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 14; 021919

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 9; FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE / DIRECTING CLAIMANT TO RESPOND --- 20 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMOTION; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer RONDOLINO, ANTHONY); ADVERSARIAL PRELIMINARY HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 8; 071119 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 6; FOR PROBABLE CAUSE AND FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR; Doc # 7; ADVERSARIAL PRELIMINARY HEARING W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND; Doc # 4; FORFEITURE BOND/BOND # 64538963 / $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 3; (EX PARTE) FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE FOR SEIZED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (SRS); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELINDA A MORRIS, ESQ