Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/16/2021 at 06:21:59 (UTC).

DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC Vs. DALES PROPERTY MAINTENANCE LLC, DALE LAMPSON

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DALES PROPERTY MAINTENANCE LLC, DALE LAMPSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, North County Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC

1281 Court Street

Clearwater, FL 33756

Defendants

LAMPSON, DALE

Port Richey, FL 34668

DALES PROPERTY MAINTENANCE LLC

R/A Sarah C Mallett 8001 Valmy Lane

Port Richey, FL 34668

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

03/04/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

03/04/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

03/03/2021: AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - DEFT

COVID ZOOM 1ST HEARING - TUESDAY - SC PRETRIAL - PLTF

05/18/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Doc # 9; 9214890194038333504130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Doc # 10; 9214890194038333503973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 7; DALE LUMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP; Doc # 8; DALES PROPERTY MAINTENANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 1; W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 4; Party: DALES PROPERTY MAINTENANCE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT; Doc # 5; Party: LAMPSON, DALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 334.00; Total Payments and Credits; 334.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-05296; DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC; (334.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 334.00; Total Payments and Credits; 334.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY INC; Total Financial Assessment; 334.00; Total Payments and Credits; 334.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DECKS AND DOCKS LUMBER COMPANY, INC. is a litigant