This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 04/03/2019 at 08:00:27 (UTC).

DEBRA L JUDD, et al Vs. KEVIN ABBOTT

Case Summary

On 02/02/2019 DEBRA L JUDD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEVIN ABBOTT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUDD, JAMES E

Phoenix, AZ 85020

JUDD, DEBRA L

Phoenix, AZ 85020

Defendant

ABBOTT, KEVIN

Largo, FL 33771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS L HILKERT

Attorney at DOUGLAS L HILKERT PA

2557 Nursery Road Suite A

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/01/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

02/14/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

02/14/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/12/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/12/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

02/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/15/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERT OF MAILING - TENANT EVICTION

02/05/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

02/02/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

02/02/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

02/02/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 14; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 13; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 10; Party: ABBOTT, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 12; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20434, Page 22, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 7; 020519; Party: ABBOTT, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 8; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 9; Party: JUDD, DEBRA L; Party: JUDD, JAMES E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 5; Party: ABBOTT, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 3; NOTICE FROM LANDLORD TO TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: ABBOTT, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; JUDD, DEBRA L; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-04724; JUDD, DEBRA L; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; JUDD, DEBRA L; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less