Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2021 at 00:25:54 (UTC).

DAVON BROWN, MINOR Vs. DANIELLE HARPER, et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 DAVON BROWN, MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIELLE HARPER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MINKOFF, THOMAS H and WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MINKOFF, THOMAS H

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEJIAS, MONIQUE

Tampa, FL 33613

BROWN, DAVON, MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN MEJIAS, MONIQUE

BROWN, DEVON

Tampa, FL 33613

Defendants

MCKINNON, LAUREN EVON

HARPER, DANIELLE

St. Petersburg, FL 33712

HARPER, ANGELA

St. Petersburg, FL 33712

MCKINNON, LAWRENCE JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRANDON R SCHEELE, ESQ

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN TAMPA PA

One Tampa City Center 201 N Franklin St 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

ROBERT HINES

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES PL

1312 W Fletcher Ave Ste B

Tampa, FL 33612

ROBERT RYAN SAINZ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

One Tampa City Center 201 No Franklin St 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

R RYAN SAINZ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA PA

One Tampa City Center 201 No Franklin St 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

COSMO BLOOM, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELLEN H EHRENPREIS

4300 W Cypress St #900

Tampa, FL 33607

BOBBI MADONNA

Attorney at MANDER LAW GROUP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2125

Tampa, FL 33602-5189

KYLE W MAXSON, ESQ

Attorney at MARTINEZ DENBO LLC

2935 First Ave N 2Nd Fl

St Petersburg, FL 33713

BRADLEY E POWERS

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/17/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER

10/10/2018: ORDER

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

08/28/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/08/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

03/19/2018: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

PRIVILEGE LOG

01/31/2018: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE

01/31/2018: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/30/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

11/14/2018: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

01/04/2021: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

01/04/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/29/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

06/29/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/03/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

03/25/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/27/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

MOTION

01/10/2019: MOTION

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED; Doc # 177; W/ATTACHED PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 176; (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Doc # 175; FOR DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Doc # 173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 174; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 171; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE; Doc # 172; OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAMENDED; Doc # 169; PETITION TO APPROVE THE SETTLEMENT OF A MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 170; (FORMAL) THAT AN AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 167; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • FinancialCLOSED PLAINTIFF - AMENDED; BROWN, DEVON; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: HARPER, ANGELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: HARPER, DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEELE, BRANDON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT HINES