This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2021 at 12:25:45 (UTC).

DAVID JOSEPH FERGUSON vs. ELIZABETH FERGUSON

Case Summary

On 06/08/2011 DAVID JOSEPH FERGUSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ELIZABETH FERGUSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROSS, RAYMOND O. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-FD

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROSS, RAYMOND O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FERGUSON, DAVID JOSEPH

Respondent

FERGUSON, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketMASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL; AS TO: ELIZABETH FERGUSON; Vol./Book 17739, Page 915, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: FERGUSON ELIZABETH; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO; Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 080612-MLD AS TO: VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; Comment: ORDER APPROVING: WITHDRAW OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 071311 9:00; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketJudgment Record/Report - Fee Paid $; Comment: JUDGMENT RECORD/REPORT FEE PAID $10.50; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $397.50; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; VER: N; K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketNOTICE FOR FAMILY LAW WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Comment: NOTICE FOR FAMILY LAW W/MINOR CHILDREN; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; Comment: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Comment: SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; Comment: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION W/MINOR CHILDREN; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 022 BY 4943 - MANUAL FDC; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less