Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 03:09:11 (UTC).

DAVID C MURRELL Vs. AMY L MURRELL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 DAVID C MURRELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AMY L MURRELL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-FD

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MURRELL, DAVID C

Zephyrhills, FL 33541

Respondent

MURRELL, AMY L

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; MURRELL, AMY L; Total Financial Assessment; 9.00; Total Payments and Credits; 9.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-12194; MURRELL, AMY L; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; MURRELL, AMY L; Total Financial Assessment; 9.00; Total Payments and Credits; 9.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MURRELL, DAVID C; Total Financial Assessment; 438.00; Total Payments and Credits; 438.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-03162; MURRELL, DAVID C; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MURRELL, DAVID C; Total Financial Assessment; 438.00; Total Payments and Credits; 438.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MURRELL, DAVID C; Total Financial Assessment; 438.00; Total Payments and Credits; 438.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 10; Vol./Book 20754, Page 922, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MURRELL, DAVID C; Total Financial Assessment; 438.00; Total Payments and Credits; 438.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16398; MURRELL, AMY L; (207.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MURRELL, DAVID C; Total Financial Assessment; 438.00; Total Payments and Credits; 438.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 5; Party: MURRELL, AMY L; Party: MURRELL, DAVID C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less