Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 11:49:15 (UTC).

DARIN WALK, MELISSA WALK Vs. BONNIE SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 DARIN WALK, MELISSA WALK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BONNIE SMITH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALK, DARIN

Clearwater, FL 33762

WALK, MELISSA

Clearwater, FL 33762

Defendant

SMITH, BONNIE

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAWN M YESNER, ESQ

Attorney at YESNER LAW PL COUNTRYSIDE COLONIAL CTR

2753 Sr 580 Suite 202

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendant Attorney

GAVIN STEWART

Attorney at GAVIN N STEWART ESQ

340514

Tampa, FL 33694

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

11/05/2019: STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

SMALL CLAIMS RESET DEFT NOTICE

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

09/13/2019: TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY

CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

09/13/2019: CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); Result: SC HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketREFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL; Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT); OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 23; PLAINTIFF; Party: YESNER, SHAWN M, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED; Doc # 24; Party: SMITH, BONNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALK, DARIN; Total Financial Assessment; 300.00; Total Payments and Credits; 300.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-23606; YESNER, SHAWN M, ESQ; (300.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; WALK, DARIN; Total Financial Assessment; 300.00; Total Payments and Credits; 300.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM; Doc # 1; CIRCUIT DIVISION 19-004352-CI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 2; 062519 CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 13; 081219 AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 14; 081219 EXHIBIT RESIDENTIAL LEASE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 15; 081219 EXHIBIT CORRESPONDENCR RE: INTENTION TO IMPOSE CLAIM FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 16; 081219 EXHIBIT CORRESPONDENCE RE: DAMAGES / MANAGEMENT SIGNATURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 17; 081219 EXHIIT END OF LEASE DAMAGES TO HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 18; 082319 DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 19; 090519 CORRESPODENCE TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 20; 090519 ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MTN TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 21; 090519 FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY; Doc # 22; 090619 CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART , GAVIN N.