Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 13:18:22 (UTC).

DARCY LASH, et al Vs. FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 DARCY LASH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

LASH, JAMIE

Dunedin, FL 34698

LASH, MARK

Dunedin, FL 34698

LASH, DARCY

Dunedin, FL 34698

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID LOW

Attorney at DAVID LOW & ASSOCIATES PA

2101 West Commercial Blvd Suite 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

DAVID LOW, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

SEAN GOLD, ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

12/27/2019: NOTICE

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

08/20/2019: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/10/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/22/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/02/2019: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

07/02/2019: NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/18/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/18/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

06/18/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/18/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 15; WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 13; OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 12; Party: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 10; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 9; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; /DISCLOSURE /DESIGNATION OF EMAIL; Party: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM; Doc # 7; 062819 FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LASH, DARCY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-22905; LASH, DARCY; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LASH, DARCY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; ISSUED; Party: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, David, ESQ.