This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 09:15:45 (UTC).

DANA MARIE LEZON Vs. EDWN JOSEPH LEZON, JR, et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 DANA MARIE LEZON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EDWN JOSEPH LEZON, JR. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEZON, DANA MARIE FORMERLY KNOWN AS SOUTHERLAND, DANA MARIE FORMERLY KNOWN AS WILLIAMSON, DANA MARIE

St. Petersburg, FL 33731

Defendants

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA A NATIONAL BANK

1680 Capital One Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

LEZON, EDWN JOSEPH, JR

Clearwater, FL 33764

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARLETT M MASSEY

Attorney at MASSEY LAW GROUP PA

Post Office Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM G BOSTICK JR, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF W G BOSTICK JR

5315 First Avenue South

St Petersburg, FL 33707

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/03/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/03/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

11/29/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

01/13/2022: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/07/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER

02/08/2022: ORDER

EXHIBIT

01/13/2022: EXHIBIT

NOTICE

01/05/2022: NOTICE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 25; ON DEFT'S AMENDED MOTN TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Doc # 24; 01/31/2022 (NOT SIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 23; A MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 20; (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 21; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Doc # 19; OF MAILING W/ATTACHED CLERKS DEFAULT UPON COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION; Doc # 18; TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MAKE COMPANION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT; Doc # 16; Party: LEZON, DANA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED; Doc # 17; 12/15/2021; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; LEZON, DANA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: LEZON, EDWN JOSEPH, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 5; WARRANTY DEED DATED FEB 8 2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 6; PROPERTY RECORD CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 7; MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 8; APPLICATION TO MARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 9; FINAL JUDGMENT CASE 14-1885-SC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M