This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/26/2023 at 20:11:24 (UTC).

CURTIS COOPER Vs. CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 CURTIS COOPER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF ST PETERSBURG. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, CURTIS

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHELSEA CROMER, ESQ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN TAMPA P A

One Tampa City Center 201 No Franklin St 7Th Flr

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH P PATNER

Attorney at EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/28/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

EXHIBIT

10/28/2022: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/28/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/04/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/05/2023: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

12/14/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/21/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/28/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

11/30/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 12; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 10; 11212022; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 9; 11282022; Party:; CROMER, CHELSEA, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COOPER, CURTIS; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-38987; COOPER, CURTIS; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COOPER, CURTIS; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 7; Party:; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less