This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:09:57 (UTC).

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC Vs. KIMBERLY HASWELL, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KIMBERLY HASWELL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC

3902 N. Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CRYSTAL LAKE

3902 N. Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendants

GAINES, RONALD

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

HASWELL, KIMBERLY

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

HASWELL, KIMBERLY ALSO KNOWN AS HASWELL, KIMBERLY SUE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

GAINES, RONALD ALSO KNOWN AS GAINES, RONALD LEE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN C CHASE

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

3902 North Marguerite St

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AGREEMENT

12/18/2019: AGREEMENT

ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

12/26/2019: ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAGREEMENT; Doc # 10; FOREBEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 121119; Party: HASWELL, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 9; 121119; Party: GAINES, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: GAINES, RONALD; Party: HASWELL, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46006; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; RENTAL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; DEMAND FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: HASWELL, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: GAINES, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less