This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:31 (UTC).

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC Vs. JANE HATCH

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JANE HATCH. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CRYSTAL LAKE

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendants

HATCH, JANE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

HATCH, JANE ALSO KNOWN AS HATCH, JANE MARIE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA SKOGLUND MAZARIEGO, ESQ

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

3902 North Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/30/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/18/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/20/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/20/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/18/2019: DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/20/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/13/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; RETD EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; COUNT I; Party: HATCH, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20827, Page 1806, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 8; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 9; ENTERED; Party: HATCH, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 10; JANE HATCH A/K/A JANE MARIE HATCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; Party: CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 7; 121119; Party: HATCH, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: HATCH, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-45911; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; (195.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLEASE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; B DEMAND FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: HATCH, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less