This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/27/2019 at 07:03:12 (UTC).

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC Vs. DAVID IRLAND, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVID IRLAND. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAGGER, EDWIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAGGER, EDWIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CRYSTAL LAKE

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendants

IRLAND, DAVID

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

DINSMORE IRLAND, DENISE

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

IRLAND, DAVID ALSO KNOWN AS IRLAND, DAVID EMERSON

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA SKOGLUND MAZARIEGO, ESQ

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

3902 North Marguerite Street

Tampa, FL 33603

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/19/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

12/20/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/19/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EXHIBIT

12/06/2019: EXHIBIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 15; IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; Party: DINSMORE IRLAND, DENISE; Party: IRLAND, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; DAVID IRLAND AND DENISE DINSMORE IRLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 13; COUNT I (POSSESSION; Party: CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 8; 121119; Party: DINSMORE IRLAND, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 121119; Party: IRLAND, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • HearingCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: DINSMORE IRLAND, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • HearingCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 7; Party: IRLAND, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingCOMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; A 5 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 4; ISSUED; Party: IRLAND, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 5; ISSUED; Party: DINSMORE IRLAND, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-45924; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; (205.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; CRYSTAL LAKE MHC LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.