This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/30/2021 at 21:49:29 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION Vs. BRIONNIA ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIONNIA ANDERSON. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-CO

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

ANDERSON, BRIONNIA

Garnishee

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/04/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

03/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

02/04/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES

FINAL JUDGMENT

03/20/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

03/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

W-Transmittal to Judge - Garnishment or Hearing

W-Transmittal to Judge - Garnishment or Hearing

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

01/22/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 28; OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES; Doc # 26; RETURN SERVED BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 25; TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 23; BOCA CIEGA REHABILTATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 24; MAILED TO ATTN: WRITS ABC LEGAL SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREOPEN - CLOSED; Doc # 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-00105; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; (85.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED; Doc # 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Doc # 22; W/ATTACHMENT - BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC - SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW 01/16/2020; Party: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 8; 12418; Party: WHITE, ASHLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Doc # 6; Party: ANDERSON, BRIONNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Doc # 7; SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-40135; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; (320.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 1; ISSUED; Party: WHITE, ASHLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: ANDERSON, BRIONNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3; FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 4; PAYMENT HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less