This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/30/2021 at 20:05:00 (UTC).

COURTESY MHP LLC, et al Vs. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES, et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 COURTESY MHP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, TANYA

Naples, FL 34109

BEAUCAGE, THOMAS

Naples, FL 34109

BOWLIN, CHAD

Naples, FL 34109

BRUCE, WINTER

Naples, FL 34109

CARDENAS, KATHRYN

Naples, FL 34109

CARDENAS, REYES

Naples, FL 34109

CARRILLO ALVAREZ, RICARDO

Naples, FL 34109

CHICK, DOUGLAS

Naples, FL 34109

CORTES, YOSELIN ROSQUERO

Naples, FL 34109

COURTESY MHP LLC

2517 50Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33714

CRESPO, ROLANDO

Naples, FL 34109

DATILLO, MARIO ATTORNEY IN FACT LANCASTER, BARRETT

Naples, FL 34109

Defendants

BURKLEY, DAVID

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

COURTESY RENTALS LLC

5828 Mariner Street

Tampa, FL 33609

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

Tallahassee, FL 32399

HYLER, ARIANNA

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

MORRISS, RICHARD

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

OLIVA, GABRIEL

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

SPRADLIN, JEREMY S

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

TORRES, JESUS CERDE ALSO KNOWN AS CERDA, JESUS

St. Petersburg, FL 33714

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARLETT M MASSEY

Attorney at MASSEY LAW GROUP PA

Post Office Box 262

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA GREENE, ESQ

Attorney at DEPT OF HWY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

2900 Apalachee Pkwy A-432

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0504

GREGORY T ELLIOTT

Attorney at ELLIOTT BERGER P A

10225 Ulmerton Rd Ste 4-A

Largo, FL 33771

 

Court Documents

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

12/16/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

SUMMONS - SERVED

12/14/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

CLERK DEFAULT

12/10/2021: CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/09/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/19/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING

11/19/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING

EXHIBIT

11/19/2021: EXHIBIT

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 102; W/ ATTACHMENTS; Party: COURTESY RENTALS LLC; Party: ELLIOTT, GREGORY T; Party: GREENE, PAMELA, ESQ; Party: MORRISS, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE; Doc # 101; CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO DEFT JESUS CERDA TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 99; 12112021; Party: TIBOCHA, FELIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 100; Party: TORRES, JESUS CERDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED; Doc # 97; Party: MORRISS, RICHARD; Party: TORRES, JESUS CERDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COURTESY MHP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 507.50; Total Payments and Credits; 507.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-29439; COURTESY MHP LLC; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 96; W/ ATTACHMENTS; Party: COURTESY RENTALS LLC; Party: GREENE, PAMELA, ESQ; Party: MORRISS, RICHARD; Party: TORRES, JESUS CERDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COURTESY MHP LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 507.50; Total Payments and Credits; 507.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Doc # 56; Party: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 36; 34 - AS TO JESUS CERDE TORRES BILL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 37; 35 AS TO CHAD BOWLIN LIMITED POWER OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 38; Party: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 39; Party: COURTESY RENTALS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 40; Party: OLIVA, GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 41; Party: HYLER, ARIANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 42; Party: SPRADLIN, JEREMY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 43; Party: BURKLEY, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 44; Party: MORRISS, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 45; Party: TORRES, JESUS CERDE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M