Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 03:43:24 (UTC).

CONSTANCE ALFREDA KOLB Vs. BRANDON L KOLB

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 CONSTANCE ALFREDA KOLB filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRANDON L KOLB. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-FD

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA

St Petersburg, FL 33714

Respondent

KOLB, BRANDON L

St Petersburg, FL 33714

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; Total Financial Assessment; 417.00; Total Payments and Credits; 417.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-19668; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; Total Financial Assessment; 417.00; Total Payments and Credits; 417.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 11; Party: KOLB, BRANDON L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 12; Vol./Book 20792, Page 1053, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 10; 11/26/19 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; Total Financial Assessment; 417.00; Total Payments and Credits; 417.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16478; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; (414.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA; Total Financial Assessment; 417.00; Total Payments and Credits; 417.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 8; Party: KOLB, CONSTANCE ALFREDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less