This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/26/2021 at 20:04:18 (UTC).

COLLEEN DIERKER Vs. RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 COLLEEN DIERKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIERKER, COLLEEN

Defendants

PHILLIPS, KELLIE ANNE

Lakeland, FL 33813

SCG HOTEL LLC DOING BUSINESS AS THE VINOY RENAISSANCE ST PETERSBURG RESORT AND GOLF CLUB

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW D POWELL

Attorney at MATTLAW

304 South Plant Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

KARI K JACOBSON, ESQ

Attorney at LA CAVA JACOBSON & GOODIS P A

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1250

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/14/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

03/23/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/22/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/16/2021: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/16/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/08/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/09/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/04/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/04/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/03/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

03/09/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

DEF-RESP'S MOTION

03/03/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

RECEIPT

02/25/2021: RECEIPT

CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

02/25/2021: CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 20; ANSWERS TO PREMISES LIABILITY INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 14; STANDARD PREMISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Doc # 12; OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketHIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Doc # 11; AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Doc # 9; 03092021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION; Doc # 3; FOR HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 5; TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; Party: RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DIERKER, COLLEEN; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04920; DIERKER, COLLEEN; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DIERKER, COLLEEN; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM; Doc # 1; HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY WITH ATTACHED CASE SUMMARY AND CASE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT; Doc # 2; FOR TRANSFERRED PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Operating Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POWELL , MATTHEW DOUGLAS