This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/29/2019 at 08:02:35 (UTC).

CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP Vs. SYKVIA BROWN

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SYKVIA BROWN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CO

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN FLORIDA AS LANDLORD FOR FLAGLER POINTE APARTMENTS

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendant

BROWN, SYKVIA

St Petersburg, FL 33712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES V BARRETT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V BARRETT PA

307 South Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/08/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/08/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT

01/07/2019: JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/18/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/12/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

12/12/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/12/2018: VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/13/2018: DEFAULT ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/03/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/03/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

LEASE

11/30/2018: LEASE

THREE DAY NOTICE

11/30/2018: THREE DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT

11/30/2018: COMPLAINT - II COUNTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

11/30/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 16; EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 15; ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • JUDGMENT; Doc # 13; FOR POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 11; Party: BROWN, SYKVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-POSTED; Doc # 8; 120318; Party: BROWN, SYKVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 9; AS TO COUNT I / DEFAULT ENTERED; Party: BROWN, SYKVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 10; BY DEFAULT; Party: CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 5; Party: BROWN, SYKVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 6; Party: BROWN, SYKVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • COMPLAINT - II COUNTS; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • THREE DAY NOTICE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • LEASE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2018-12879; BARRETT, CHARLES V, III; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2018-43568; CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • PLAINTIFF; CMS VRE II FLAGLER LP; Total Financial Assessment; 195.00; Total Payments and Credits; 195.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less