This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:02:48 (UTC).

CLEARWATER TT LLC, et al Vs. MONTICE HOBSON, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CLEARWATER TT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONTICE HOBSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNARY, MYRA SCOTT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNARY, MYRA SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLEARWATER TT LLC

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

FOUR LAKES AT CLEARWATER

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

CLEARWATER TT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN FLORIDA AS LANDLORD FOR FOUR LAKES AT CLEARWATER FORMERLY KNOWN AS LIV AT CLEARWATER

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendants

HOBSON, SEAN

Clearwater, FL 33760

HOBSON, MONTICE

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES V BARRETT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V. BARRETT, P.A.

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

12/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF

VERIFICATION. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/09/2020: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE

12/06/2019: NOTICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/09/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/06/2019: ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/09/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

01/17/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/09/2020: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

01/09/2020: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 14; IN FAVOR OF PLTF; Vol./Book 20858, Page 390, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; Party: HOBSON, MONTICE; Party: HOBSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 8; 12102019; Party: HOBSON, MONTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 12102019; Party: HOBSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10; ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11; Party: CLEARWATER TT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER TT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-20244; BARRETT, CHARLES V, III; (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER TT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 5; Party: HOBSON, MONTICE; Party: HOBSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF; Doc # 6; FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER; Party: HOBSON, MONTICE; Party: HOBSON, SEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER TT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46048; CLEARWATER TT LLC; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; CLEARWATER TT LLC; Total Financial Assessment; 205.00; Total Payments and Credits; 205.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 3; THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT; Doc # 4; LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less